Hain, Irene Clara (CPSO#: 13909)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 13 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997