Hain, Richard David William (CPSO#: 64577)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 1997 to 31 Jan 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 1998