Hain, Stephan (CPSO#: 107685)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2015 to 26 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2017