Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Haj Hassan, Lamia Khaled (CPSO#: 66266)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 1984

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Mar 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Mar 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1997