Hajek, David Michael (CPSO#: 78394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Minnesota, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Ave. E.
#328
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-7900
Fax: (416) 494-9179
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL HAJEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008