Hajela, Raju (CPSO#: 50662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5316 - 7005 FAIRMOUNT DRIVE SE
Calgary AB  T2H 0K4
Phone: (403) 536-2480
Fax: (403) 536-2482

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJU HAJELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983