Hajjar, George (CPSO#: 53875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
A280
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Hajjar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hajjar ( CPSO# 53875 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
A280 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 783-1641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE HAJJAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJJAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1990