Haka-Ikse, Katerina (CPSO#: 22074)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 1 888 316 4125
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2014

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Katerina Haka-Ikse to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

(i) Dr. Haka-Ikse will be retiring from the practice of medicine no later than April 15, 2014; and

(ii) Until her retirement, Dr. Haka-Ikse will not be taking on any new patients.