Hakami, Ali Hassan Hadi (CPSO#: 87684)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Khalid University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 05 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Oct 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008