Hakes, John Anthony Allan (CPSO#: 23056)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.A. Hakes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the clinic at which the patient was treated at to access medical records.
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015