Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hakim, Antoine Manuel (CPSO#: 65778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road
room 2413
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: (613) 562-5462
Fax: (613) 562-5403
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antoine Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTOINE MANUEL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992