Hakim, Hasif Rashiqul (CPSO#: 100343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Marys General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hasif Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hakim ( CPSO# 100343)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St Marys General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2G 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASIF RASHIQUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015