Hakim, Omar Javed (CPSO#: 58554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 338-6786
Fax: (905) 338-5338
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LasikMD Kitchener
Frederick Tower
101 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 6R2
Canada
Phone: (519) 772-2020
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

LasikMD Hamilton
Heritage Hill Shopping Centre
276 Mud Street West
Hamilton ON  L8J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (905) 578-1115
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

LasikMD Oakville
Dorval Crossing West
270 North Service Rd W Unit C3
Oakville ON  L6M 2R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-4740
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar J. Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Hakim ( CPSO# 58554 )

Business Address:
Lasik MD
101 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 6R2
Phone Number: (519) 772-2020

Business Address:
Lasik MD
276 Mud Street West
Hamilton ON  L7J 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 578-1115

Business Address:
316 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 338-6786

Business Address:
Lasik MD
C3 - 270 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2R8
Phone Number: (905) 845-4740

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR JAVED HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1991