Hakim, Sania (CPSO#: 65280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANIA HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 09 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993