Hakim, Shaheed Waliul (CPSO#: 96001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaheed Waliul Hakim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hakim ( CPSO# 96001 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHEED WALIUL HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016