Hakoun, Jack (CPSO#: 52765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 229-6300
Fax: (416) 229-6283
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Broadway Ave
Suite 105
Toronto ON  M4P 1T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-1460
Fax: (416) 480-0074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jack Hakoun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hakoun ( CPSO# 52765 )

Business Address:
Suite 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 229-6300

Business Address:
Suite 105
5 Broadway Avenue
Toronto ON  M4P 1T7
Phone Number: (416) 480-1460

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK HAKOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKOUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1985