Hales, Kristine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex General Hospital Alliance
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Phone: (519) 245-1500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristine Hales Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hales ( CPSO# 88557 )

Business Address:
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone Number: (519) 471-8506

Business Address:
Middlesex General Hospital Alliance
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINE ELIZABETH HALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011