Hales, Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 75297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margret Hospital
Room 16 747
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2551
Fax: (416) 946-2047
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE HALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005