Haligua, Alexis Liliane Leah (CPSO#: 88339)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexis Haligua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Montford Hospital, 713 Montreal Road, Ottawa, ON, K1K 0T2
Date Received: 27 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2012 to 19 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2016