Halil, Alexander (CPSO#: 67973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Queensway - Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4700 Ext. 1000
Fax: (613) 721-4793
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2000