Hall, Ann Mary Raphaella (CPSO#: 66413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: Utovac, Ann Mary Raphaella (used until: 17 Apr 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2443
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. S. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hall ( CPSO# 66413 )
Dr. G. Hall ( CPSO# 66436 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN MARY RAPHAELLA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998