Hall, Christopher Wayne (CPSO#: 27246)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 26 2012


Corporation Name: Chris W. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2015