Hall, Elaine Janet (CPSO#: 66569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMPA
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: 613-725-2000
Fax: 613-725-1300
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE JANET HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995