Hall, Jeremy Alan (CPSO#: 74002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-6006
Fax: (416) 359-1601
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hall ( CPSO# 74002 )

Business Address:
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-6006

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY ALAN HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004