Hall, John Douglas (CPSO#: 24676)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.D. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: To request a copy of records please fax Dr. Hall at 519-583-2287
Date Received: 25 Mar 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 1, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of July 1, 2014, Dr. John Douglas Hall has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.