Hall, Karen Evaline (CPSO#: 56776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatrics Clinics
E Ann Arbor Hlth & Geriatrics Cntr
4260 Plymouth Road
Ann Arbor MI  48109
United States
Phone: (734) 764-6831
Fax: (734) 763-2064

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN EVALINE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987