Hall, Michael Clement (CPSO#: 17253)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 28 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1959
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2005

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 1, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 1, 2005, Dr. Michael Clement Hall undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following:
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any
jurisdiction.