Hall, Philippa Grace (CPSO#: 52961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Faculty of Medicine
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: (613) 562-5800 Ext. 8108
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPA GRACE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985