Hall, Robert Thomas (CPSO#: 19425)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004