Hall, Susan Elizabeth Helen (CPSO#: 56940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Health Information Services and Document Storage Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 Feb 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH HELEN HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987