Hall, Trevor Lawrence (CPSO#: 68049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Sports Medicine
40 George Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone: (519) 622-4529
Fax: (519) 622-3563
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
Kitchener Location
700 Strasburg Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 2M2
Canada
Phone: (519) 571-7111
Fax: (519) 571-8145
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor L. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hall ( CPSO# 68049 )

Business Address:
Grand River Sports Medicine
40 George Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 2M8
Phone Number: (519) 622-4529

Business Address:
Grand River Sports Medicine Centre
Kitchener Location
700 Strasburg Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 2M2
Phone Number: (519) 571-7111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR LAWRENCE HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996