Hall-Findlay, Elizabeth Joy (CPSO#: 30269)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: Hall, Elizabeth Joy (used until: 17 Nov 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2003