Hallett, Kristen Maureen (CPSO#: 68956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: Barrett, Kristen Maureen Hallett (used until: 02 Dec 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Phone: (905) 689 9499
Fax: (905) 689 5284
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-5090
Fax: (905) 521-5056
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen Hallett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hallett ( CPSO# 68956 )

Business Address:
103 - 170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L8B 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 689-9499

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-5090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN MAUREEN HALLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1999