Halliday, David Michael (CPSO#: 33807)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services 111 Regis Crescent South North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1 888 563 3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 12 Aug 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On November 22, 2016, David Michael Halliday was found guilty of committing an offence of care or control of a vehicle/vessel with a blood alcohol reading over .08 contrary to Section 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada. Dr. Halliday was sentenced to a 6-month conditional sentence; victim surcharge of $100; 3-year driving prohibition, and 1-year probation.