Hallmann, Clemens Erwin (CPSO#: 27333)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Nov 1987