Hallock, Abhirami (CPSO#: 86956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Oncology
Walker Family Cancer Center
1200 4th Street
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hallock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hallock ( CPSO# 86956 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHIRAMI HALLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012