Halls, Michael John (CPSO#: 33745)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Oct 1988