Halman, Mark Howard (CPSO#: 58093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite 928
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4568
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Halman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Halman ( CPSO# 58093 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
928 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HOWARD HALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1988