Halmo, Stephen Douglas (CPSO#: 50668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1P3
Phone: (519) 741-8710
Fax: (519) 741-1359
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Halmo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Halmo ( CPSO# 50668 )

Business Address:
737 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1P3
Phone Number: (519) 741-8710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN DOUGLAS HALMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALMO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1983

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On February 23, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Halmo.