Halton, Jacqueline Mary Lewis (CPSO#: 54315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARY LEWIS HALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1985