Haluk, Myron Ivan (CPSO#: 65346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
849 Upper Wentworth St
Suite 405
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone: (905) 3874508
Fax: (905) 387-6093
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Myron Haluk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haluk ( CPSO# 65346 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L8A 5H4
Phone Number: (905) 387-4508

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRON IVAN HALUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993