Halvorson, James Peter (CPSO#: 58974)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004