Ham Pong, Antony Joseph (CPSO#: 50672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smyth Medical Centre
1929 Russell Road
Suite 208
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 526-3500
Fax: (613) 741-4325
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONY JOSEPH HAM PONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAM PONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1985