Ham, Trevor John Sewell (CPSO#: 19639)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013