Hamadah, Abdulaziz A A (CPSO#: 80582)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2004 to 08 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011