Hamat, Richard Bryan (CPSO#: 54267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: (905) 850-5607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Hamat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hamat ( CPSO# 54267 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
310 - 8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-3250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD BRYAN HAMAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987