Hamboyan, Herag (CPSO#: 67920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French, Spanish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 61045
511 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville ON  L6J 6X0
Phone: (905) 466-7416
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamboyan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamboyan ( CPSO# 67920 )

Business Address:
Suite 61045
511 Maple Grove Drive
Oakville ON  L6J 6X0
Phone Number: (905) 466-7416

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERAG HAMBOYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMBOYAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996