Hamed, Azza Abdel Wahab (CPSO#: 65885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone: (905) 268-0385
Fax: (905) 268-0567
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

106-222 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON  M9P3S5
Canada
Phone: 416 -850-8947
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Azza Hamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hamed ( CPSO# 65885 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 268-0385

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZZA ABDEL WAHAB HAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 1992 to 22 Aug 1992
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2000