Hamedani, Ramin (CPSO#: 68839)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2000