Hameed, Saadia Nasreen (CPSO#: 82874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Family Medical Centre
P.O. Box 5777, Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 672-9660
Fax: (519) 672-7727
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saadia Hameed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hameed ( CPSO# 82874 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platt's Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAADIA NASREEN HAMEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007